Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/07/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/07/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/13/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2002