Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/13/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/28/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/08/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/14/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/14/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/14/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/20/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/20/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/20/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/29/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/29/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/29/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/04/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/25/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/26/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/01/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/01/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/03/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/15/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/17/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/05/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/05/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/07/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/23/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/23/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/10/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/21/2002