Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/09/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/10/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/13/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/11/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/24/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/01/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/06/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/13/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/2002
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/16/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/12/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/01/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/14/2002