Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/16/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/16/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/16/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/23/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/23/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/23/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/01/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/01/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/15/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/16/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/16/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/05/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2002