Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/27/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/27/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/27/2001
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/27/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/27/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/27/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/27/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/27/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/08/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/15/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/24/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/23/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/05/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/09/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew