Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/08/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/06/2002