Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/30/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/30/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/07/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/07/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/07/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/04/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/05/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/25/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/11/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/23/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/11/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/10/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/12/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/12/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/13/2002