Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/2002