Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/30/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/05/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/08/2002