Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2002