Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/13/2002