Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/10/2002