Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/25/2002