Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/18/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/07/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/07/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/15/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/04/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/11/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/25/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/27/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/11/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/16/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/24/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/25/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/16/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/12/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/12/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/13/2002