Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/24/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/24/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/24/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/30/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/30/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/07/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/21/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/04/2002
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/05/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/13/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/25/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/25/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/11/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/23/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/11/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/18/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/25/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/10/2002