There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/18/2002)

Amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to reduce, from December 31, 2003, through December 31, 2004, the duty on 4-(Methylsulfonyl)-2-nitrobenzoic acid (NMSBA). Increases the duty on such chemical from December 31, 2005, through December 31, 2007.