Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/23/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/23/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/26/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/26/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/11/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/25/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/25/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/25/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/12/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/12/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/03/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/03/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/03/2002