Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/29/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/29/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/29/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/29/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/29/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/29/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/29/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/29/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/29/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/29/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/29/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/01/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/01/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/06/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/06/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/09/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/25/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/02/2002