Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/06/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/06/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/04/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/06/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/06/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/20/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/12/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2002