Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/06/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/06/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/27/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/27/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/06/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/13/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/15/2001