Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/25/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/02/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/07/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/07/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/17/2002