Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/08/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/08/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/08/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/09/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/23/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/23/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/23/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/23/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/23/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/23/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/05/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/05/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/27/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/15/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/11/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/25/2002