Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/24/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/24/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/24/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/24/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/25/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/07/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/21/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/15/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/15/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/21/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/21/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/21/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/24/2002