There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To name the chapel located in the national cemetery in Los Angeles, California, as the "Bob Hope Veterans Chapel".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
05/29/2002Became Public Law No: 107-183. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2002Signed by President.
05/29/2002Presented to President.
05/22/2002Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4733)
05/21/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2780)
04/25/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
05/29/2002Became Public Law No: 107-183. (TXT | PDF)
05/29/2002Signed by President.
05/29/2002HousePresented to President.
05/23/2002SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/22/2002SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4733)
05/21/2002-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2002-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2780)
05/21/2002-6:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4592.
05/21/2002-6:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2780-2784)
05/21/2002-6:48pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/25/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/25/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/25/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/30/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/30/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/30/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/30/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/30/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/30/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/09/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/09/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/14/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/14/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/14/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/14/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/16/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/20/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/20/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/25/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4592.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4592. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/21/2002)

Designates the chapel in the national cemetery in Los Angeles, California, as the Bob Hope Veterans Chapel.