Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/25/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/30/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/30/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/30/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/30/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/30/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/30/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/30/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/30/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/30/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/09/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 05/09/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/14/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/14/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/14/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/14/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/16/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/16/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/20/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/20/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/20/2002