Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/21/2002