Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/30/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/16/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/20/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/20/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/22/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/05/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/05/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/05/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/12/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/12/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/13/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/19/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/19/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/25/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2002
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/10/2002
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 07/10/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/15/2002
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/15/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/15/2002
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/17/2002
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/17/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/23/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/23/2002
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/23/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/24/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/04/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/04/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/10/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/10/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/10/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/12/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/17/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/19/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/25/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/25/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew