Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/20/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/20/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/23/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 07/10/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/05/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/09/2002