Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/25/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/23/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/05/2002