There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permit commercial importation of prescription drugs from Canada, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/06/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/25/2002Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/01/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/15/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/15/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/06/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/06/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/12/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/17/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/17/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/21/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/08/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/08/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/11/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/26/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/01/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/08/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/09/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/25/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/06/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4614. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2002)

Amends provisions of the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act set forth in the Medicine Equity and Drug Safety Act of 2000 to: (1) direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to promulgate regulations permitting pharmacists and wholesalers to import Food and Drug Administration (FDA)-approved prescription drugs from Canada (currently, from Australia, Canada, Israel, Japan, New Zealand, Switzerland, South Africa, the countries in the European Union and the European Free Trade Association, or other countries designated by the Secretary); and (2) exclude an infused or intravenously injected drug or a drug that is inhaled during surgery.

Prohibits discrimination in the sale of prescription drugs by manufacturers to pharmacists or wholesalers, requiring: (1) terms as favorable as those provided to foreign purchasers; and (2) full access to drugs permitted to be imported.

Continues the requirement that exported donated prescription drugs may only be reimported by the manufacturer.

Permits the Secretary to waive the prohibition against importing a prescription drug or device on a case-by-case basis, particularly those from Canada that are FDA-approved and for limited personal use.

Requires a study and report by the: (1) Institute of Medicine of the National Academy of Sciences on the regulatory compliance of importers of drugs; and (2) Comptroller General on how drug prices were affected.