Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/30/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/30/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/02/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/02/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/02/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/07/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/07/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/22/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/22/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/22/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/18/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/19/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/21/2002