Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/01/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/02/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/08/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/09/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/16/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 05/21/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/06/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/10/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/10/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/10/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/13/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/18/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/20/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/08/2002