Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/08/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/15/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/05/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2002