Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/20/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/20/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/13/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew