Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/02/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/02/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/02/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/07/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/08/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/08/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/15/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/21/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/21/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/21/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/04/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/04/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/04/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/05/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/05/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/11/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/11/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/12/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/18/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/18/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/08/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/08/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/15/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/18/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/24/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/26/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/17/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/17/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/17/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/07/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/07/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/28/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/22/2002