Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/18/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/15/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/19/2002
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/19/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/19/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/19/2002