Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/09/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/09/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/14/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/21/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/04/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/22/2002