Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/02/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/07/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/07/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/07/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/07/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/14/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/14/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/14/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/15/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/15/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/16/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/22/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/06/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/11/2002