Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/16/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/16/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/05/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/12/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/12/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/24/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/27/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/27/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/11/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/11/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/17/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/25/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/24/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/10/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/16/2002