Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/08/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/08/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/20/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 05/20/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/20/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/21/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2002