Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/07/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/07/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/07/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/09/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/09/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/14/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/14/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/14/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/14/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/14/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/14/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/14/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/23/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/04/2002