Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/21/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/10/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/12/2002