Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2002