Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/06/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/21/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/21/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/21/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/21/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/21/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/10/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/10/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/10/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/10/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/18/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/12/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/12/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2002