Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/08/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/05/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/05/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/05/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/05/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/13/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/21/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/13/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/13/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/13/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/13/2002