There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Abortion Non-Discrimination Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Abortion Non-Discrimination Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit certain abortion-related discrimination in governmental activities.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/25/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 189, 2 Present (Roll no. 412).(text: CR H6574)
05/09/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
09/30/2002SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 620.
09/26/2002SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
09/25/2002-2:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2002-2:35pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 189, 2 Present (Roll no. 412). (text: CR H6574)
09/25/2002-2:24pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 191 - 230 (Roll no. 411). (text: CR H6584)
09/25/2002-1:57pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
09/25/2002-1:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require addition of amendments which clarify the effects of the legislation on patients and employees as well as state law.
09/25/2002-1:46pmHouseMr. Brown (OH) moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce.
09/25/2002-1:45pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/25/2002-12:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4691.
09/25/2002-12:36pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
09/25/2002-12:36pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 546. (consideration: CR H6574-6586)
09/25/2002-12:35pmHouseRule H. Res. 546 passed House.
09/24/2002-7:41pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 546 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
05/17/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2002HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/09/2002HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/20/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/20/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/22/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/06/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/06/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/10/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/10/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/10/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/10/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/18/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/26/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/10/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/12/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/12/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/12/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/19/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/19/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/24/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/24/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/24/2002
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/24/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/24/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/09/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/17/2002 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4691. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/25/2002)

Abortion Non-Discrimination Act of 2002 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to prohibit the Federal Government, and any State or local government that receives Federal financial assistance, from discriminating against any health care entity because (in addition to current prohibited reasons) the entity refuses to provide coverage of, or pay for, induced abortions. Expands the definition of "health care entity" to include (in addition to physicians) other health professionals, a hospital, a provider sponsored organization, a health maintenance organization, a health insurance plan, and any other kind of health care facility, organization, or plan.