Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/10/2002
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/24/2002