Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/10/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/2002