Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/19/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/24/2002