Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 05/09/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/10/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/12/2002